Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano De Cicco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca

Titular Bishop of Aezani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1880BornNapoli
19 Mar 190423.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 193958.7AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
16 Apr 193958.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
22 Mar 196281.8RetiredBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
22 Mar 196281.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aezani
14 Nov 196282.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano De Cicco:
Bishop Gaetano De Cicco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013