Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel León y Garrido

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1824BornCuenca
8 Dec 184723.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 188460.5AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
25 Jan 188560.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
31 Mar 190075.9DiedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Miguel León y Garrido:
Bishop Miguel León y Garrido (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 221
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013