Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Leménager

Deceased

Bishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1900BornGrande Digue
5 Apr 192424.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 195353.3AppointedBishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
31 Aug 195353.5Ordained BishopBishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
17 Aug 196767.5DiedBishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Albert Leménager
Bishop Albert Leménager (born , died ) Bishop of Yarmouth

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Aug 2016