Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Latussek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Diana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1787Born
21 Sep 181124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
12 Feb 183851.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
12 Feb 183851.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
27 May 183851.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
17 Aug 185770.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Daniel Latussek (VIAF: 20539860)
Bishop Daniel Latussek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGroß Wartenberg
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 23
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,400
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Jul 2020

Quantcast