Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Joseph Chwane Khumalo, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Durban

Titular Bishop of Buxentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1918BornMapumulo
3 Jul 194628.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
27 Feb 197860.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durban, South Africa
27 Feb 197860.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
4 May 197860.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buxentum
2 Mar 199981.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Durban, South Africa
27 Apr 200688.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Durban, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Dominic Joseph Chwane Khumalo:
Bishop Dominic Joseph Chwane Khumalo O.M.I. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Durban

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014