Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
15 Jul 1968 | Born | ||
13 Jul 1993 | 24.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Dublin, Ireland |
2003² | 34.4 | Appointed | Official of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
23 Apr 2022 | 53.7 | Appointed | Secretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland |
Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠