Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Kaggwa

Bishop Emeritus of Masaka, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1943 Born
12 Dec 197128.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 199451.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Masaka, Uganda
24 Jun 199552.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Masaka, Uganda
10 Jan 199854.7SucceededBishop of Masaka, Uganda
16 Apr 201976.0RetiredBishop of Masaka, Uganda

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Kaggwa
Bishop John Baptist Kaggwa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Masaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBulenga
Ordained BishopKitovu, Cathedral, Masaka, Diocese of Masaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Masaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,597
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast