Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serverus Jjumba

Bishop of Masaka, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1962 Born
20 Jun 199229.8Ordained PriestPriest of Masaka, Uganda
16 Apr 201956.7AppointedBishop of Masaka, Uganda
6 Jul 201956.9Ordained BishopBishop of Masaka, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Serverus Jjumba
Bishop Serverus Jjumba (born ) Bishop of Masaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatinnyondo-Kyannamukaala, Diocese of Masaka
Ordained BishopKitovu Sports Arena, Masaka, Diocese of Masaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Masaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 22 Apr 2019
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast