Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Viliam Judák

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1957 BornHarvelka
16 Jun 198527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
9 Jun 200547.6AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
16 Jul 200547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Viliam Judák:
Bishop Viliam Judák (born ) Bishop of Nitra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nitra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,945

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013