Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hans-Jochen Jaschke

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hamburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tisili


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1941 Born
28 Jan 196725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Osnabrück, Germany
18 Nov 198847.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Osnabrück, Germany
18 Nov 198847.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisili
8 Jan 198947.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisili
24 Oct 199453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamburg, Germany
8 Oct 201675.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hamburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hans-Jochen Jaschke (VIAF: 200326486)
Bishop Hans-Jochen Jaschke (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hamburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeuthen/Oberschlesien

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hamburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,134
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017