Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Huzsvár

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zrenjanin, Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1931Born
29 Jun 195827.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 198856.8AppointedBishop of Zrenjanin, Serbia
14 Feb 198856.9Ordained BishopBishop of Zrenjanin, Serbia
30 Jun 200776.3RetiredBishop of Zrenjanin, Serbia
10 Dec 201685.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Zrenjanin, Serbia

MicroData Summary for László Huzsvár
Bishop László Huzsvár (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zrenjanin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorgoš

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,526
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast