Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Hombach Lütkermeier

Bishop Emeritus of Granada, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1933 Born
28 Jun 196127.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 199561.4AppointedBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
22 Apr 199561.6Ordained BishopBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
15 Dec 200370.2AppointedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
11 Mar 201076.4RetiredBishop of Granada, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Hombach Lütkermeier (VIAF: 42146285389715370349)
Bishop Bernardo Hombach Lütkermeier (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrefeld, Germany

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Granada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,593
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast