Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Gorospe y Irala, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649¹Born
1 Jun 169950.4AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
22 Jan 170253.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
20 May 171566.3DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Gorospe y Irala
Bishop Diego de Gorospe y Irala O.P. (born 1649, died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla, México

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,857
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast