Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Gómez González

Bishop of Tenancingo, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1954 Born
23 Apr 198329.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
26 Nov 200955.7AppointedBishop of Tenancingo, México, México
25 Jan 201055.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tenancingo, México, México

MicroData Summary for Raúl Gómez González
Bishop Raúl Gómez González (born ) Bishop of Tenancingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapilla de Guadalupe
Ordained BishopGrounds of, San Clemente, Cathedral Basilica, Tenancingo, Diocese of Tenancingo, México

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tenancingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast