Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian Goffart

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

Titular Bishop of Uzita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1921Born
25 Jul 195231.5Ordained PriestPriest of Aachen, Germany
2 Dec 197756.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
2 Dec 197756.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzita
18 Feb 197857.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzita
17 Jul 198059.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Goffart
Bishop Maximilian Goffart (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalterherberg

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018