Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pjetėr Gjura

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1875BornShködre
Jan 1910³34.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 192953.9AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
4 Aug 192954.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
9 Jul 193964.0DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pjetėr Gjura:
Archbishop Pjetėr Gjura (born , died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013