Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Giorgi

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1885Born
8 Apr 191227.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 193348.4AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
29 Oct 193348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
8 Jun 196479.1DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Giorgi
Bishop Emilio Giorgi (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucignano d'Arbia

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018