Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Bianchi

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1885BornMontepulciano
21 Sep 190722.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 194156.0AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
25 May 194156.2Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
12 Aug 195166.4DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Bianchi:
Bishop Gustavo Bianchi (born , died ) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015