Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Baldini, O.M.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

Apostolic Administrator of Montepulciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1901Born
12 Jul 192524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of the Mother of God
31 Jul 194140.3AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
12 Oct 194140.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
1964²62.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Montepulciano, Italy
2 Jan 197068.7DiedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Baldini (VIAF: 66518355)
Bishop Carlo Baldini O.M.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFivizzano

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018