Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Petrilli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Siena

Titular Bishop of Apollonias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1885BornSiena
10 Aug 190924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Siena, Italy
2 Sep 196378.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siena, Italy
2 Sep 196378.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonias
6 Oct 196378.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonias
9 Feb 196883.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Petrilli:
Bishop Enrico Petrilli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Siena

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013