Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio García de Palacios

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornMéxico
13 Sep 167755.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
20 Nov 167856.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
1 Jun 168260.4DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio García de Palacios:
Bishop Juan Antonio García de Palacios (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,443
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,636
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015