Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Gächter

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Betagbarar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1939 Born
28 Jun 196727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Basel e Lugano, Switzerland
3 Feb 198747.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
3 Feb 198747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Betagbarar
28 May 198747.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Betagbarar
22 Dec 201475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Martin Gächter
Bishop Martin Gächter (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBasel

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast