Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Fenocchio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pontremoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1904Born
5 Dec 192622.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 195450.3AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
11 Feb 195550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
10 Jun 198378.8RetiredBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
16 Apr 199691.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Pontremoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Fenocchio
Bishop Giuseppe Fenocchio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pontremoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolini di Prelà

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast