Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Pierre Louis Marie Fauchet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1918BornLangourla
13 Jul 194324.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 196748.2AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
1 May 196748.4Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
4 Apr 199273.3RetiredBishop of Troyes, France
8 Jan 200081.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for André Pierre Louis Marie Fauchet:
Bishop André Pierre Louis Marie Fauchet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Nov 2013