Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Essayan, O.F.M. Conv.

Vicar Apostolic of Beirut {Bairut}

Titular Bishop of Mareotes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1962 BornAchrafieh
8 Sep 198826.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
17 Apr 199330.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
21 Sep 199331.3Professed (Perpetual Vows)Priest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 Aug 201654.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Beirut {Bairut}, Lebanon
2 Aug 201654.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mareotes
8 Oct 201654.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mareotes

MicroData Summary for César Essayan
Bishop César Essayan O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Beirut {Bairut}

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Beirut {Bairut}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2016
  • ob: CB, 4 Aug 2016
  • c2+: CB, 7 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Oct 2016