Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Đura Džudžar

Bishop of San Nicola di Ruski Krstur (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1954 Born
7 Sep 198026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
3 Mar 200146.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
3 Mar 200146.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Acrassus
19 Mar 200146.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acrassus
28 Aug 200349.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Serbia e Montenegro (Križevci), Serbia
19 Jan 201358.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of Serbia (Križevci)
6 Dec 201864.6AppointedBishop of San Nicola di Ruski Krstur (Križevci)

MicroData Summary for Đura Džudžar (VIAF: 101145609)
Bishop Đura Džudžar (born ) Bishop of San Nicola di Ruski Krstur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceĐurđevo
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of San Nicola di Ruski Krstur (Križevci).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,942
  • c1: CB, 23 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Jan 2019

Quantcast