Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alojzije Slavko Večerin

Bishop of Subotica, Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1957 Born
14 Aug 198326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Subotica, Serbia
8 Sep 202063.2AppointedBishop of Subotica, Serbia
14 Nov 202063.4Ordained BishopBishop of Subotica, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Alojzije Slavko Večerin
Bishop Alojzije Slavko Večerin (born ) Bishop of Subotica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSubotica-Palić, Apostolic Administration of Jugoslavenska Backa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Subotica, Diocese of Subotica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Subotica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast