Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph D’Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Bellary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1932BornVirajpet
9 Apr 196028.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 199260.6AppointedBishop of Bellary, India
9 Mar 199361.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bellary, India
17 Nov 200674.7DiedBishop of Bellary, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph D’Silva:
Bishop Joseph D’Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Bellary

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,058
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015