Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ignacio de la Rocha

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1715Born
12 May 177762.2AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
18 Jan 177862.9Ordained BishopBishop of Michoacán, México
3 Feb 178165.9DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Ignacio de la Rocha
Bishop Juan Ignacio de la Rocha (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto de Santa María, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,899
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 94, Number 483
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,778, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast