Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Antonio Ramos Lora, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1722Born
24 Sep 174624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
23 Sep 178260.2AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
22 Jun 178360.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
9 Nov 179068.3DiedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Antonio Ramos Lora
Bishop Juan Manuel Antonio Ramos Lora O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Palacios y Villafranca, Spain

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,414
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 99, Number 511
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018