Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastião de Andrade Peçanha

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Goa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1676³Born
16 Dec 171539.9AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
22 Mar 171640.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
25 Jan 172145.0ResignedArchbishop of Goa, India
2 Mar 173761.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Goa, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastião de Andrade Peçanha
Archbishop Sebastião de Andrade Peçanha (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 211
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,063
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017