Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bosco Chang Shin-Ho

Auxiliary Bishop of Daegu {Taegu}

Titular Bishop of Vescera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1966 BornDaegu
25 Aug 199832.2Ordained PriestPriest of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
31 May 201650.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
31 May 201650.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vescera
12 Jul 201650.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vescera

MicroData Summary for John Bosco Chang Shin-Ho
Bishop John Bosco Chang Shin-Ho (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Daegu {Taegu}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 12 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jul 2016