Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Chilekwa Chisanga, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Mansa, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1971 Born
1992²20.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1998²26.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 Jun 199928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Nov 201342.5AppointedBishop of Mansa, Zambia
1 Feb 201442.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mansa, Zambia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Chilekwa Chisanga
Bishop Patrick Chilekwa Chisanga O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Mansa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamuchanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mansa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 1 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 5 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,088

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast