Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Conrad Chaumont

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec

Titular Bishop of Arena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1875BornSainte-Anne des Plaines
24 Sep 189823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
28 Jun 194166.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
28 Jun 194166.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arena
15 Aug 194166.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arena
8 Oct 196691.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Conrad Chaumont:
Bishop Joseph-Conrad Chaumont (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013