Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Maria Cavagna

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1879Born
8 Jun 190222.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 196282.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
23 Sep 196282.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
30 Apr 197090.4DiedTitular Bishop of Tium

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Maria Cavagna
Bishop Alfredo Maria Cavagna (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Italy

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast