Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Castelltort Subeyre

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1899BornIgualada
26 May 192324.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 195657.7AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
17 Feb 195757.9Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
18 Aug 196061.4DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Castelltort Subeyre:
Bishop José Castelltort Subeyre (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013