Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valter Carrijo, S.D.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Brejo, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1934 BornUberlandia
2 Feb 195420.0ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Savior
8 Dec 196127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
18 Jan 198955.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Brejo, Maranho, Brazil
15 Apr 198955.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Brejo, Maranho, Brazil
25 Sep 199157.7SucceededBishop of Brejo, Maranho, Brazil
5 May 201076.3RetiredBishop of Brejo, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Valter Carrijo:
Bishop Valter Carrijo S.D.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Brejo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brejo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013