Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Capizzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caltagirone

Titular Archbishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1880BornCalascibetta
11 Apr 190322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
16 Sep 193252.0AppointedBishop of Campagna, Italy
8 Jan 193352.3Ordained BishopBishop of Campagna, Italy
12 Aug 193756.9AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
11 Nov 196080.2RetiredBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
11 Nov 196080.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
7 Jul 196180.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Caltagirone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Capizzi:
Archbishop Pietro Capizzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caltagirone

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013