Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damián Santiago Bitar

Bishop of Oberá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1963 BornArroyo Cabral
13 Dec 198724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Villa María, Argentina
4 Oct 200845.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Justo, Argentina
4 Oct 200845.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
8 Dec 200845.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
26 Oct 201047.7AppointedBishop of Oberá, Argentina
4 Dec 201047.8InstalledBishop of Oberá, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Damián Santiago Bitar:
Bishop Damián Santiago Bitar (born ) Bishop of Oberá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oberá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,994
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013