Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang Bischof

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Nebbi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1960 BornFreising
2 Jul 198827.7Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
5 Jan 201049.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
5 Jan 201049.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nebbi
28 Feb 201049.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nebbi

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Bischof:
Bishop Wolfgang Bischof (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2010
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,580

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013