Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Dietl

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sebarga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1934 Born
195318.7ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
23 Aug 195925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
198651.7IncardinatedPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
22 Dec 199864.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
22 Dec 199864.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebarga
7 Feb 199964.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebarga
5 Jan 201075.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Dietl
Bishop Franz Dietl (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoosburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,475

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast