Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benoît Bertrand

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1960 Born
23 Jun 199030.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nantes, France
29 Jun 199131.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
17 Jan 201958.6AppointedBishop of Mende, France
3 Mar 201958.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Benoît Bertrand
Bishop Benoît Bertrand (born ) Bishop of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained DeaconSaint-Piere, Cathedral, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained PriestSaint-Piere, Cathedral, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame-et-Saint Privat, Cathedral, Mende, Diocese of Mende

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mende.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2019
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,112
  • od/c01: AJ, 30 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 May 2019

Quantcast