Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Benlich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornBagnaluca
27 Feb 165141.1AppointedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia
25 Jun 165141.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia
30 Jan 167464.0DiedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Benlich
Bishop Matteo Benlich O.F.M. (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 117
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 111
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016