Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Belli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1811Born
20 Sep 183423.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187160.1AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
5 Nov 187160.2Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
2 Sep 189786.0RetiredBishop of Terni, Italy
2 Sep 189786.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
21 Jan 190492.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Belli (VIAF: 88822925)
Archbishop Antonio Belli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCitta di Castello
Ordained BishopSantissima TrinitÓ dei Monti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 197, and Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017