Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giustino Puletti

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1828Born
20 Dec 185123.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 187547.5AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
10 Oct 187547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
21 Feb 189263.9DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giustino Puletti (VIAF: 90194556)
Bishop Giustino Puletti (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giustino, Diocese of Città di Castello
Ordained BishopSubiaco, Territorial Abbey of Subiaco

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017