Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Bascuñana y López

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1905Born
2 Jun 192822.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 195549.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
18 Sep 195549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
20 May 196458.3AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
19 Feb 197771.1ResignedBishop of Solsona, Spain
14 Jan 197973.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Bascuñana y López
Bishop José Bascuñana y López (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrihuela

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018