Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amleto de Angelis, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1919Born
18 Jul 194324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
30 May 196344.3AppointedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
14 Jul 196344.5Ordained BishopBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
25 Feb 196748.1DiedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Amleto de Angelis
Bishop Amleto de Angelis M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Viana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArtena, Italy

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast