Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Alvarez González, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios

Titular Bishop of Scyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1902BornNembro, Spain
26 Sep 192624.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 194643.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios, Peru
14 Mar 194643.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Scyrus
30 Jun 194644.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scyrus
2 Jun 194845.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios, Peru

MicroData Summary for Enrique Alvarez González:
Bishop Enrique Alvarez González O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013