Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Alimane Alminaza

Bishop of San Carlos, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1959 Born
29 Apr 198626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bacolod, Philippines
29 May 200848.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jaro, Philippines
29 May 200848.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Byzacena
4 Aug 200849.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Byzacena
5 Aug 200849.0InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Jaro, Philippines
14 Sep 201354.1AppointedBishop of San Carlos, Philippines
18 Nov 201354.2InstalledBishop of San Carlos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Alimane Alminaza
Bishop Gerardo Alimane Alminaza (born ) Bishop of San Carlos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Jose, Sipalay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Carlos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,940
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018