Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton (Gerardo Antonio) Žerdín Bukovec, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic of San Ramón

Titular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1950 BornLendava, Slovenia
9 Nov 197525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jan 200251.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru
19 Jan 200251.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
14 Apr 200251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
11 Mar 200352.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru

MicroData Summary for Anton (Gerardo Antonio) Žerdín Bukovec:
Bishop Anton (Gerardo Antonio) Žerdín Bukovec O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of San Ramón

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of San Ramón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 15 Oct 2014